Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 81372-COA & 81372
Short Caption:EPPS (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71727, 71727-COA, 81372
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A809661, C285595Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/24/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/24/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-23399
07/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-24578
07/08/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal A809661 - VOL 1. (SC)20-25214
07/08/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal A809661 - VOL 2. (SC)20-25218
07/08/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (C285595), Vols. 1 - 9, Via FTP. (SC)20-25259
07/14/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - SEALED Pages 1-23, 28-50, and 399-409. (SC)
07/21/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)20-26541
09/09/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).20-34393
09/18/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
09/18/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
02/10/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-10510
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13248
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2021. (SC)21-13248