Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81817
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF HAROLD P. GEWERTERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/28/2020How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol I of IV. (SC).20-34661
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol II of IV. (SC).20-34663
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol II of IV. Cont... (SC).20-34664
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol II of IV. Cont... (SC).20-34665
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol II of IV. Cont... (SC).20-34666
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol II of IV. Cont... (SC).20-34667
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol III of IV. (SC).20-34668
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol IV of IV. (SC).20-34670
09/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).20-34674
10/28/2020Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
12/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to Reopen Briefing and File Opening Brief. (SC)20-44971
12/22/2020MotionFiled Motion For Leave to Withdraw As Counsel (Counsel for Appellant). (SC)20-46175
01/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for Harold P. Gewerter subsequently filed an untimely motion to reopen briefing and file an opening brief. Counsel then filed a motion to withdraw as counsel, explaining that Gewerter no longer wishes to litigate this matter. The motion to withdraw is granted. The clerk shall remove Thomas F. Pitaro and Emily K. Strand of the Law Offices of Pitaro & Fumo, Chtd., as counsel of record for Gewerter. This matter shall stand submitted for decision on the record. (SC)21-00637
04/23/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Suspension. "Commencing from the date of this order, we hereby impose a one-year suspension on attorney Harold P. Gewerter's practice of law in Nevada based on the misconduct in Docket No. 81540, and a four-year concurrent suspension on his practice of law based on the misconduct in Docket No. 81817." Silver, J., with whom Herndon, J., agrees, dissenting. En Banc. Nos. 81540/81817.21-11755
04/29/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order of Suspension. (SC)21-12294
05/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14396
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 25, 2021. (SC)21-14396