Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81821
Short Caption:GOLDEN CREEK HOLDINGS, INC. VS. NATIONSTAR MORTG. LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A812406Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-34696
09/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-34700
09/28/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hong & Hong. Check no. 3678. (SC)
09/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-35665
09/30/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).20-35870
10/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-37644
10/20/2020MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-38526
10/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's docketing statement due: November 19, 2020. (SC)20-38787
11/18/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-42224
11/23/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Lis Pendens. (SC)20-42741
12/10/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike the Notice of Lis Pendens, Motion to Expunge the Lis Pendens, and Motion for Sanctions. NRAP 2 Relief Requested (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/10/20). (SC)
12/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance (Scott R. Lachman). (SC)20-44970
12/11/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Scott Lachman. (SC)20-45034
12/17/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Rescission of Notice of Lis Pendens. (SC)20-45772
01/27/2021MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix. (SC)21-02602
01/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 1, 2021. (SC)21-02611
03/01/2021MotionFiled Appellant's First Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-06013
03/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: March 15, 2021. (SC)21-06114
03/15/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-07530
03/15/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)21-07532
04/14/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: April 28,2021. (SC)21-10753
04/15/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-10944
05/12/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: June 1, 2021. (SC)21-13672
06/01/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-15583
06/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19802
07/23/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: August 10, 2021. (SC)21-21280
08/05/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Supplemental NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. (SC)21-22786
08/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition For Rehearing. (SC)21-23294
08/10/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Attorney Joseph Y. Hong. (SC)
08/20/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-24303
08/30/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration due: September 17, 2021. (SC)21-25161
09/15/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-26774