Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80467-COA
Short Caption:ANORUO VS. VALLEY HEALTH SYS., LLCCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78600, 80467, 81579
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A760949Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's denial of NRCP 60(b) relief." fn1[We direct the clerk of the court to amend the caption for this case to conform to the caption on this order.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-13969
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (REMITTITUR RECALLED/CASE REINSTATED PER ORDER FILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 7/19/21). (COA)
07/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
08/04/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Petition for Rehearing and Request to Allow # of Pages." (COA)Y21-22686