Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81042-COA
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
11/20/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[We have reviewed all documents Grimes has filed in this matter, and we conclude no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)20-42492
11/23/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion of Errata to Amend the Motion to Correct an Illegal Sentence. (SC)20-42668
12/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On November 20, 2020, this court entered an order affirmance. On November 23, 2020, this court received a pro se "motion of errata to amend the motion to correct an illegal sentence." No good cause appearing, this court denies appellant's motion. (COA)20-44511
12/08/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)20-44606
01/25/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-02139
02/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
02/19/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)