Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81837
Short Caption:BAKER (JOEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR2007178Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
09/24/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-35200
10/09/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-37132
11/04/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Rowan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:07/28/20, 08/25/20, 09/08/20 and 08/25/20. (SC)20-40180
11/13/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-41597
11/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC).20-41620
12/03/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: December 28, 2020. (SC)20-43735
12/27/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-46559
01/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the answering brief. The motion is not signed by counsel of record for respondent. No action will be taken on the motion. (SC)21-00099
01/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Answering Brief. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-01052
01/20/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/22/21). (SC)
01/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance (Anthony Robert Gordon). (SC)21-01924
01/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Waiver of Right to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-01906
01/28/2021MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-02680
01/28/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-02690
02/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The untimely motion for an extension of time filed on January 28, 2021, is granted. The answering brief was filed on January 28, 2021. (SC)21-03028
02/01/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16898
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19204
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 8, 2021. (SC)21-19204