Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81838
Short Caption:ROBINSON VS. HOTCHKISSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83250
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A762264Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/05/2020 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/24/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-35205
09/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-35208
09/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-35223
10/05/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Harold P. Gewerter. Check no. 3304. (SC)
10/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-36452
10/05/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-36474
10/05/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (SC).20-36546
10/22/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/9/19 and 4/9/19. (SC)20-38754
10/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC).20-39472
11/03/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).20-40041
11/06/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program and Reinstating Briefing. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-40613
11/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-40724
12/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Counsel. The clerk shall remove Mr. Gewerter as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant's notice of appearance due: 45 days. The deadlines to file documents in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. Mr. Gewerter shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on appellant and provide this court with written proof of service. (SC)20-44942
02/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Michael F. Bohn. (SC)21-03277
02/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk shall add attorney Michael F. Bohn as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC)21-03685
02/22/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/24/20 and 02/25/20. To Court Reporter: Gina Villani. (SC)21-05236
02/25/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Stay Briefing. (SC)21-05526
03/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause and File Amended Docketing Statement. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. In responding to this order, in addition to points and authorities, appellant shall file and serve an amended docketing statement that contains complete responses to all items and contains copies of all documents required by item 27. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant's motion to stay briefing is denied as moot. (SC)21-06722
04/07/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-10042
04/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement due: May 7, 2021. (SC)21-10623
04/13/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/24/20 and 2/25/20. (SC)21-10653
04/27/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Supplemental Response to Order to Show Cause Filed on March 8, 2021. (SC)21-12112
05/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-13463
06/07/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16162
06/07/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16162