Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81839
Short Caption:RLC FIRST, LLC VS. ARLINGTON TOWERS HOACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV2000702Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2020 / Hamilton, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/25/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-35327
09/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-35329
09/25/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Mark R. Thierman. (SC)
09/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-35349
09/30/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul F. Hamilton. (SC).20-35929
10/16/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-38190
10/26/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 7, 2020, at 9:30 am. (SC).20-39206
12/15/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-45460
12/16/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-45551
12/29/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/15/20 and 08/05/20. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. (SC)20-46872
02/25/2021MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Stay Appeal Pending Mediation. (SC)21-05632
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have filed a stipulation to "stay" the briefing of this appeal pending their participation in a settlement conference. The stipulation is treated as a joint motion. See NRAP 27(a)(1). This court declines to suspend the briefing schedule indefinitely, but grants the motion to the following extent. Appellant shall have until June 14, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-06446
06/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice of Settlement and Stipulation and Order to Stay Appeal. (SC)21-17086
06/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have filed a notice of settlement and stipulation to "stay" this appeal pending their performance of certain terms within the settlement agreement. The stipulation is treated as a joint motion, see NRAP 27(a)(1), and is granted to the following extent. Opening brief and appendix or motion to dismiss due: July 30, 2021. (SC)21-18377
07/21/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Settlement. (SC)21-20987
07/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-21663