Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81842
Short Caption:GUZMAN (WILBER) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79079, 82342
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR190447Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/07/2021 at 1:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/07/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/25/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
09/25/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)Y20-35350
09/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)20-35352
11/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Supplemental Appendix and Directing Answer. Petitioner shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental appendix containing the transcript of the grand jury proceedings. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 28 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. (SC).20-41499
11/16/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix. (SC).20-41673
12/11/2020Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-45088
12/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-45090
12/11/2020AppendixFiled Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-45091
12/11/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/18/2020MotionFiled Petition's Request for Permission to File a Reply to the Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-45783
12/18/2020Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition. (SC)20-45784
12/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Errata to Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-45932
12/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner's motion for leave to file a reply to the answer filed by real party in interest is granted. The reply was filed on December 18, 2020, and errata to reply was filed on December 19, 2020. (SC)20-46334
03/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 7, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. The argument will be video conferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-06190
03/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-08384
04/07/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc court. 81842. (SC)