Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81866
Short Caption:GONZALEZ (RAUL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A813142Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
10/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-36133
10/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC)20-37239
11/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Substitution of Attorneys for Frank A. Toddre II. (SC)20-40925
11/18/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Decision and Order. Filed in District Court on 11/18/2020. (SC)20-42169
11/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-42371
12/04/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. A813142. Vol.1 (SC)20-44070
12/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Appearance for Adam M. Solinger. (SC)20-45270
12/17/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) Pages 36-41 and 42-45. (SC)
04/20/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. The Attorney General shall, within 14 days of this order, file a response indicating whether appellant has been paroled, and, if so, provide appropriate documentation. (SC)21-11434
04/22/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-11589
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12331
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15029
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15029