Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81872
Short Caption:IN RE: THE SRP 2015 IRREVOCABLE TR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P098083Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/06/2020 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
10/02/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-36269
10/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-36271
10/02/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Aaron D. Shipley. (SC)
10/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-36418
10/06/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC).20-36682
10/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/15/20 and 09/24/20. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. (SC)20-38154
10/26/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-39219
11/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)20-41263
11/30/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The decision to move forward with a settlement conference or to request removal is still under consideration by the settlement judge and counsel. (SC)20-43262
05/26/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)21-15111
05/27/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. The clerk shall attach a copy of that transcript request form to this order. Court reporter Kerry Esparza's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC)21-15174
06/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-15694
06/29/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause due: July 16, 2021. (SC)21-18672
07/16/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-20651
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-22141
08/24/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-24686
08/24/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)