Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81877
Short Caption:NEVIUS VS. DIST. CT. (WARDEN)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68047, 82479
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF-1211022Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
10/05/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Exhibits attached) (SC)20-36397
12/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest and respondent shall have 28 days from the date of this order to file and serve answers, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the last-filed answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-45542
01/13/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real party in interest's answer to writ petition due: January 27, 2021. (SC)21-01047
01/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel. Steve Shevorski, Chief Litigation Counsel, and Sabrena K. Clinton, Deputy Attorney General, represent Respondent The Honorable Gary D. Fairman for The Seventh Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada, In and For the County of White Pine in this matter. (SC)21-01146
01/14/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent The Seventh Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada, in and for the County of White Pine, shall have until January 27, 2021, to file and serve its answer to the petition for writ. (SC)21-01178
01/20/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Frank A. Toddre, II, Senior Deputy Attorney General has assumed responsibility for representing the interest of the Real Party in Interest, Renee Baker, in place of Jared Frost, Senior Deputy Attorney General). (SC)21-01692
01/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Counsel. The clerk shall add attorney Frank A. Toddre II as counsel of record for real party in interest. (SC)21-02427
01/27/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-02521
01/27/2021Petition/WritFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-02535
01/27/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume II of II. (SC)21-02539
01/27/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume I of II. (SC)21-02540
02/11/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for New Counsel. (SC)21-04164
02/16/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Motion for Counsel. (SC)21-04554
02/18/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Joinder to Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Motion for Counsel. (SC)21-04893
02/18/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)21-04898
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner has filed a pro se motion for the appointment of counsel. The court declines to appoint counsel for petitioner for the purpose of this writ petition. Petitioner's reply in support of petition due: 14 days. (SC)21-06443
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13954
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-16362
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)