Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81884
Short Caption:KNICKERBOCKER VS. EXTRA SPACE STORAGE, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A814223Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/15/2020 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
10/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-36582
10/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-36587
10/12/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Craig Henderson. (SC)
10/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-37529
10/15/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC).20-37956
11/03/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-40062
11/04/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 6, 2020 at 9:30 am. (SC).20-40200
11/04/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).20-40201
11/06/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-40608
11/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/28/2020. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 11/13/2020) (SC)
11/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-41577
11/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file a reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC)20-42418
11/24/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/28/20. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. (SC).20-42924
12/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's response to this court's order to show cause due: January 4, 2021. (SC)20-45736
01/04/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-00113
01/05/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/28/20. (SC)21-00215
01/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC)21-00399
01/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Settlement. A dismissal in compliance with NRAP 42(b) will be submitted forthwith. (SC)21-00606
03/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file ether a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-09242
04/07/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-10055
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-10425