Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81900
Short Caption:KADMIRI VS. MGM GRAND RESORTS INT'LCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81619, 81900-COA, 81903
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A799553Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/05/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
10/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-36900
10/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)20-36902
10/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-36904
10/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA) (SC)20-37597
10/15/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Fourth NOA) (SC)20-37879
10/19/2020Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-38269
10/19/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for the Supreme Court to Order the Transmission of Records and Transcripts. (SC)20-38270
10/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. The motion filed on October 19, 2020, is denied as moot. (SC)20-38557
10/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Leave to Allow District Court Opportunity to Reconsider. (SC)20-38569
10/21/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 2/5/21) (SC)
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. A799553. Vol. 1 (SC)20-39696
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. A799553. Vol. 2 (SC)20-39705
11/05/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) Pages 1-3, 17-18, 74-240, 241-266, and 361-362. (SC)
11/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Leave to Amend Opening Informal Brief. (DETACHED INFORMAL BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 2/5/21). (SC)20-41444
02/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a "Request for Leave to Allow District Court Opportunity to Reconsider." That motion is denied as moot. The clerk of this court shall detach the informal brief from the motion filed on November 13, 2020, and file it separately. The clerk shall strike the informal brief filed on October 21, 2020. (SC)21-03530
02/05/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-03531
02/05/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
02/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-04948
02/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
06/09/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals
06/09/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Review. (SC)21-16566
06/16/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice, Request for Certificate of Appealability. (SC)21-17308
06/22/2021Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied. EN BANC (SC)21-17872
06/22/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17875
06/22/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 23, 2021. (SC)21-17875