Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81901
Short Caption:NOLAN VS. GIBBONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A813173Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/31/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
10/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-36908
10/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)20-36912
10/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-36918
10/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Sabrena K. Clinton, Deputy Attorney General as counsel for respondents). (SC)20-37561
10/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC)20-38097
10/21/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 090/09/20. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)20-38573
10/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. At this stage of the proceedings, this court is unable to determine which transcripts, if any, are necessary for this court's review on appeal, see NRAP 9(b)(1)(C), and therefore, the court declines to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time. (SC)20-38750
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC)20-39597
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 2. (SC)20-39598
10/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Case. (SC)20-39651
10/29/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-39653
10/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-39666
11/05/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1 to 6 and 34 (SEALED). (SC)
11/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals). (SC)20-41195
11/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-41203
12/15/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion - Hearing Requested - for Emergency Hearing for an Injunctive Order Due to Racial Discrimination. (SC)20-45463
12/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Steve Shevorski, Chief Litigation Counsel as counsel for respondents). (SC)20-45782
12/21/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Emergency Hearing for Injunctive Order. (SC)20-46085
12/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting this court to issue injunctive relief. Respondents oppose the motion. Appellant's motion does not indicate that he has moved for this relief in the district court, nor does it demonstrate why doing so would be impracticable. Accordingly, appellant's motion is denied, without prejudice. (SC)20-46324
01/25/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion and Sanctions. (SC)21-02129
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On December 23, 2020, this court denied appellant's motion for injunctive relief, without prejudice. Appellant has filed a motion for reconsideration of that order and for sanctions. The motion for reconsideration and for sanctions is denied. (SC)21-02847
02/05/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.21-03558
03/31/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16901
06/25/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration (Rehearing). (SC)21-18284
07/07/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-19388
08/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22280
08/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 3, 2021. (SC)21-22280