Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81903
Short Caption:KADMIRI VS. DIST. CT. (MGM GRAND RESORTS INT'L)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81619, 81900, 81900-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A799553Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Petition. (SC)
10/08/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-36939
10/08/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (SC)20-36941
10/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-36945
10/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Ex Parte Request for Submission. (SC)20-38570
10/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Petitioner's Ex Parte Request for Submission. (SC)20-38572
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. (SC)20-39399
11/10/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Request for Leave to Amend Petition. (SC)20-41205
11/20/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [In light of this disposition, petitioner's request for leave to amend his petition is denied as moot.] KP/JH/AS. (SC)20-42495
12/15/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)20-45358
12/15/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)