Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81918
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF BRIAN C. PADGETTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/09/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
10/09/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol I of II. (SC).20-37270
10/09/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol II of II. (SC).20-37271
10/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).20-37274
11/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)20-40994
11/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief due: December 9, 2020. (SC).20-41476
12/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second). (SC)20-44679
12/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Brian Padgett's opening brief due: December 23, 2020. (SC)20-45181
12/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC)20-46253
12/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Padgett's opening brief due: January 8, 2021. (SC)20-47021
01/08/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). (SC)21-00643
01/12/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (Fifth Request) (SC)21-00863
01/12/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-00959
01/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The motions of Brian C. Padgett for fourth and fifth extensions of time to file the opening brief are granted. The state Bar of Nevada shall have until February 11, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-01066
02/11/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-04191
03/15/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-07531
03/16/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed. (SC).
05/21/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Suspension. "We hereby suspend attorney Brian Padgett from the practice of law in Nevada for five years commencing from the date of this order." En Banc. (SC).21-14665
06/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Courts. (SC)21-15484
06/15/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17177
06/15/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 6, 2021. SC)21-17177