Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81929
Short Caption:PHILLIPS VS. WILKINSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A777195Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/22/2020 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
10/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-37587
10/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-37589
10/20/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from American Family Insurance Group (Tanika Capers) Check No.0003085010. (SC)
10/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-38460
10/21/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC)20-38667
10/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Motion to Dismiss Appeal). (SC)
10/22/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC).20-38816
10/26/2020MotionFiled Defendant's (Appellant's) Reply to Plaintiff's (Respondent's) Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC)20-39227
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The motion is denied. (SC)20-39529
11/06/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. (SC).20-40712
11/11/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-41223
11/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)20-41265
02/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Tanika M. Capers). (SC)21-03314
02/08/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-03757
02/10/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-03959
06/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. On February 10, 2021, this court directed appellant to file and serve a transcript request form by February 24, 2021, and the opening brief and appendix by May 11, 2021. To date, the required documents have not been filed with the clerk of this court and counsel for appellant has not otherwise communicated with this court. Opening brief and appendix due: 7 days. Transcript request form due: 7 days. (SC)21-16247
06/10/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeals. (SC)21-16740
06/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-17055