Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80267-COA
Short Caption:PANICARO VS. STOREY CTY.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80266, 80266-COA, 80267
Lower Court Case(s):Storey Co. - First Judicial District - 18OC000131EClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve responses addressing the issues raised in this appeal and the arguments made in appellant's informal brief. The responses shall not exceed ten pages plus the attorney's certificate required by NRAP 28.2. The responses need not include the table of contents and table of cases, statutes, and other authorities required by NRAP 28(b). Appellant shall have 15 days from the date the last response is served to file any reply. (COA)21-11188
05/14/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Response to Order filed April 19, 2021, due: June 2, 2021. (COA)21-13877
06/02/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (COA)21-15641
06/02/2021AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix (Volume 1 of 1). (COA)21-15642
06/08/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: July 1, 2021. (COA)21-16384
06/25/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Reply Brief. (COA)21-18322
06/25/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (COA)
07/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-20555
08/10/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/10/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)