Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81959
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY, LLC SER. 1501 RAVANUSA DR. VS. SEVEN HILLS MASTER CMTY. ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83001
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A749332Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/21/2020 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Due. (SC)
10/19/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-38275
10/19/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-38277
10/19/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau. (SC)
10/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-38350
10/21/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC).20-38551
11/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)20-40135
11/09/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-40828
11/18/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued. Settlement Judge is waiting for more information and requests up to 30 more days for ECAR. (SC)20-42047
11/24/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-42874
11/24/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.20-42920
11/25/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program and Reinstating Briefing. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-43113
12/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/13/17, 06/26/17 and 03/03/20. To Court Reporter: Jessica Kirkpatrick. (SC)20-44380
02/19/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 9, 2021. (SC)21-05053
03/09/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix or Dismiss Appeal (Second Request). (SC)21-06836
04/01/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal Stipulation of Dismissal. (SC)21-09473
04/06/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. fn1 [Given this dismissal, the court takes no action on the motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief.] (SC)21-09880