Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81975
Short Caption:MORGAN VS. DIST. CT. HARVEST MGMT. SUB LLC C/W 80837Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80837*, 81975Related Case(s):77753, 78596, 80837
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A718679Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Micah S. Echols. (SC)
10/21/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)Y20-38574
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ, Vols. 1 - 22. (SC)20-38635
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ, Vol. 23. (SC)20-38637
12/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 28 days. (SC)20-45540
01/07/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real party in interest shall have until January 27, 2021, to file and serve the answer to the petition for writ. (SC)21-00463
01/27/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief with Addendum. (SC)21-02555
01/27/2021AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Appendix to Answer. (SC)21-02558
02/03/2021MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (First Request). (SC)21-03365
02/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner shall have until March 12, 2021, to file and serve the reply. Failure to timely file the reply may result in the waiver of the opportunity to file a reply. (SC)21-03681
03/12/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Second Request). (SC)21-07324
03/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner shall have until March 19, 2021, to file and serve the reply. (SC)21-07558
03/19/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Third Request). (SC)21-08073
03/22/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)21-08232
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner's motion for a third extension of time to file a reply in support of the petition is granted. The reply was filed on March 22, 2021. (SC)21-08650
04/16/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Consolidate. (Case No. 81975 and 80837)(SC)21-11147
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Consolidate. Nos. 80837/81975. (SC)21-13718
09/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petitions DENIED." Herndon, J., with whom HARDESTY, C.J., joins, dissenting - EN BANC. Nos. 80837/81975. (SC)21-26602
10/11/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. Nos. 80837/81975. (SC)21-29022
10/11/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 80837/81975. (SC)