Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81981
Short Caption:POWELL VS. MOORECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78905, 78905-COA, 79172, 79172-COA, 79458
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788606Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/23/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
10/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-38874
10/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-38876
11/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC)20-39830
11/05/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)20-40341
11/13/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) Pages 1-3, 13-16, 17, and 19-20. (SC)
03/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Document. To date, appellant has failed to file a brief or to otherwise communicate with this court. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief or informal brief for pro se parties. (SC)21-09101
04/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-12495
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15115
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15115