Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80548-COA
Short Caption:BYRD VS. BYRDCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80548, 81198
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D577701Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/30/2021 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:03/30/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
02/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 23, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system. On or before February 23, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). (COA).21-03905
03/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. The argument currently scheduled for March 23, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. is vacated. Oral argument is rescheduled for March 30, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. Oral argument will be held by videoconference as outlined in our prior order setting oral argument. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (COA)21-05991
03/30/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. 80548-COA.(COA21-BB/MG/JT) (COA).