Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81070-COA
Short Caption:CHAUDHERY VS. STATE, DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVS.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81070
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 19OC000821BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/30/2021 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:03/30/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
02/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 23, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. On or before February 23, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (COA)21-03269
02/23/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice (Gabriel D. Lither, Senior Deputy Attorney General will be arguing on behalf of the Respondents). (COA)21-05275
03/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. The argument currently scheduled for March 23, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. is vacated. Oral argument is rescheduled for March 30, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. Oral argument will be held by videoconference as outlined in our prior order setting oral argument. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (COA)21-05993
03/30/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. 81070-COA.(COA21-BB/MG/JT) (COA).
06/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Reversing in Part, Affirming in Part, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED IN PART AND AFFIRMED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-17375
06/22/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (COA)21-17910
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)