Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82045
Short Caption:POUND VS. JAMESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82046
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0300255Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Chief Justice Hardesty for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/06/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
11/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-40574
11/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-40576
11/06/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay Form for Parties Without Attorneys. (SC)20-40587
11/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC)20-40593
11/06/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)20-40603
11/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant filed with this court a copy of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis that was filed in the district court on October 28, 2020. The district court shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, enter a written order resolving the motion in compliance with NRAP 24. (SC)20-42151
12/03/2020Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on December 3, 2020. (Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis). (SC)20-43884
12/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. In light of the district court's December 3, 2020 order granting appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, no filing fee is due for this appeal. (SC)20-44534
12/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-44629
01/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Filing Deadlines. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant: Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 14 days. The informal brief has been filed. The parties shall disregard the notice regarding deadlines issued on December 8, 2020. (SC)21-00893
01/20/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 1). (SC)21-01639
01/20/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 2). (SC)21-01640
01/20/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (VOL 3). (SC)21-01641
01/26/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED Record on Appeal - Vol. 4. (SC)
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for a stay pending appeal. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC)21-02826
02/01/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-03048
04/05/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." JH/LS/AS (SC)21-12302
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15032
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2021. (SC)21-15032