Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82053
Short Caption:BERMAN (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76999, 76999-COA, 82053-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A813710, C321802Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/02/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/06/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-40686
11/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC)20-41815
12/02/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A813710 - Vol. 1 Part 1. (SC)20-43693
12/03/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-5 (Via FTP). (SC)20-43730
12/08/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - SEALED Pages 1 - 40, 232 - 240 (PSI Report), 241 - 249 (Supp. PSI Report), and 995 - 1045. (SC)
12/15/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)20-45459
02/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
02/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-04949
02/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13263
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2021. (SC)21-13263