Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81576-COA
Short Caption:TELLIS VS. STATE, BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RSCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81576
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20OC000611BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/10/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
02/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response addressing the issues raised in this appeal and the arguments made in appellant's September 3 brief. The response shall comply with NRAP 28 and NRAP 32. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of service of the response to file any reply. (SC)21-04312
03/08/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's response to the opening brief due: March 29, 2021. (COA)21-06726
03/25/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (COA)21-08525
04/13/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Answer and Opposition Brief (Reply). (COA).21-10659
07/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We affirm the district court's order denying Tellis's writ petition insofar as the petition challenged the Board's decision to deny him parole. But to the extent the petition challenged the Board's failure to schedule a rehearing, we reverse the district court's order denying the petition, and remand for the court to issue an order directing the Board to schedule a rehearing within five years of Tellis's August 2019 parole hearing." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-21328
08/17/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/17/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)