Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80815-COA
Short Caption:BROWN (CAROLINE) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):74845, 74845-COA, 80815
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C321063Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/12/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
11/20/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk - JAVS recordings for February 13, 2017 and for July 12, 2017. (COA)
05/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-13183
06/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/01/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)