Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82078
Short Caption:SFR INVS. POOL 1, LLC VS. NATIONSTAR MORTG., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69400, 75890
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A684715Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/13/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
11/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-41531
11/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-41536
11/16/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert. (SC)
11/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-41721
11/17/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-41778
11/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Scott R. Lachman as counsel for the Respondent). (SC).20-43014
12/01/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/19/20 and 8/26/20. To Court Reporter: Robin Page. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL 12/1/20) (SC)
12/01/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/19/20 and 8/26/20. To Court Reporter: Robin Page.(SC)20-43491
12/07/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-44354
03/11/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Stay. (SC)21-07165
03/18/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Stay. (SC)21-07899
03/25/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Appeal. (SC)21-08572
04/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to "stay" this appeal. The motion is granted to the following extent. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Within 45 days of the date of this order, appellant shall file a status report in this court regarding the certiorari proceedings in SFR Investments Pool 1. If the certiorari proceedings are resolved prior to the expiration of the 45-day period, appellant shall immediately notify this court in writing. (SC)21-09575
04/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Status Report. (SC)21-12064
04/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. (SC)21-12173
05/28/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (First Request)(SC)21-15335
06/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 28, 2021. (SC)21-15596
06/25/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Second Request)(SC)21-18428
07/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 28, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-19247
07/28/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-21878
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)21-21881
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC)21-21883
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC)21-21884
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4. (SC)21-21886
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5. (SC)21-21888
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6. (SC)21-21890
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7. (SC)21-21891
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8. (SC)21-21894
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 9. (SC)21-21896
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 10. (SC)21-21897
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 11. (SC)21-21898
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 12. (SC)21-21899
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 13. (SC)21-21900
07/28/2021AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 14. (SC)21-21901
08/09/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Answering Brief Deadline (First Request). (SC)21-23101
08/10/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent shall have until September 27, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief.21-23218
09/27/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-27815
09/27/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)21-27816
10/04/2021BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondent and Affirmance of the District Court's Judgment. (SC)21-28430