Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82082
Short Caption:SOLANDER (DWIGHT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67710, 67711, 76228, 76405, 76405-COA, 82427, 82427-COA, 83506
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A815535, C299737Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/13/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-41590
11/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC)20-41805
12/03/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. A815535. Vol.1 (SC)20-43810
12/04/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. C-14-299737-1. Via FTP. Vols. 1-16. (SC)20-43922
12/07/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: Corrected Certification of Copy Page to Record on Appeal submitted 12/03/2020 - C299737-1. (SC)20-44209
12/11/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 20-240, 241-480, 481-720, 721-838, 1563-1680, 1681-1920, and 1921-2160. (SC)
12/11/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 2161-2400, 2401-2640, 2641-2880, 2881-3120, 3121-3360, 3361-3600, and 3601-3675. (SC)
12/17/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) Pages 1170-1180. (SC)
03/18/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-07827
04/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. The Attorney General shall, within 14 days of this order, file a response indicating whether appellant has been paroled, and, if so, provide appropriate documentation. fn1 [Given this order, this court defers ruling on appellant's motion for an extension of time to file an opening brief.] (SC)21-09435
04/07/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Documentation About the Status of Appellant's Sentence. (SC)21-09983
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." fn1 [Given this order, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file an opening brief is denied as moot.] NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11706
05/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14398
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 25, 2021. (SC)21-14398