Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82086
Short Caption:DEPENBROCK (JEFFREY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A817785, C247303Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/30/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/16/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/16/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-41685
11/30/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-43203
12/04/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)20-43970
03/03/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-06262
03/03/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1. (SC)21-06263
03/31/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler. (SC)21-09298
03/31/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-09300
03/31/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. (SC)21-09301
04/30/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-12430
04/30/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
06/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-15807
06/10/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-16667