Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82090
Short Caption:BOLDEN (JASON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79715, 82306
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C334635Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/17/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-41798
11/25/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP20-RP/JH/EC (SC)20-42969
12/21/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-46049
12/21/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
01/12/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 23 2020. (SC)20-46049