Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82092
Short Caption:HOWERTON VS. STATE, DEP'T OF BUS. AND INDUS.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A812614Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/17/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
11/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-41819
11/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-41823
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC)20-44294
12/23/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)20-46307
12/30/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - SEALED Pages 70-73, and 79-81. (SC)
03/31/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcript request form, the docketing statement, and either an opening brief or informal brief. (SC)21-09361
05/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-13462
06/07/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16172
06/07/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16172