Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82093
Short Caption:APOLLO (LANCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C339671Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/17/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-41856
11/25/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-42990
01/19/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/24/19, 05/09/19, 07/02/19, 07/23/19, 07/30/19, 08/13/19, 08/13/19, 09/05/19, 09/10/9, 09/10/19, 11/07/19, 01/07/20, 02/06/20, 02/13/20, 02/25/20, 02/27/20, 03/17/20, 05/19/20, 07/09/20, 07/30/20, 08/05/20, 08/06/20, 09/01/20 and 10/15/20. To Court Reporter: Sharon Nichols and Matt Yarbrough.21-01612
01/19/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/15/20, 09/29/20, 10/06/20, 10/15/20, 11/03/20 and 11/12/20. To Court Reporter: Yvette Sison. (SC)21-01614
02/17/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette G. Sison stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/15/20, 09/29/20, 10/06/20, 10/15/20, 11/03/20 and 11/12/20. (SC)21-04722
02/22/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Opening Brief). (SC)21-05158
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 17, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-05802
05/06/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time (Opening Brief). (SC)21-13031
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: June 16, 2021. (SC)21-13719
06/15/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-17267
06/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. (SC)21-17446
07/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-19034
07/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Having been so informed, appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. This court "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-20134