Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82094
Short Caption:TOBIN VS. STOKESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82234, 82294
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A799890Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/25/2020 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/17/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
11/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-41867
11/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-41869
11/17/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from John W. Thomson. (SC)
11/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-42054
11/25/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (SC)20-43029
12/09/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-44787
12/15/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued until February 5, 2021 at 12:00 PM. (SC)20-45466
12/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/11/20, 10/29/20 and 11/03/20. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/28/20). (SC)
12/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-46584
12/30/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/11/20, 10/29/20, and 11/3/20. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. (SC)20-46914
01/21/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/11/20, 10/29/20, and 11/3/20. (SC)21-01834
02/12/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The EAC was held on 2/5/21, and continued to 2/15/21 to give appellant's counsel time to confer with his client. Case Nos. 82094/82234/82294. (SC).21-04287
02/18/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Case Nos. 82094/82234/82294. (SC)21-04801
02/22/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 45 days opening brief. (SC)21-05140
03/31/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-09352
04/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 10, 2021. (SC)21-09453
05/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-13342
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: June 10, 2021. (SC)21-13722
06/10/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Consolidate 82094/82234/82294. (SC)21-16780
06/22/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals in Docket Nos. 82094 and 82234, and Disapproving Stipulation. As this court lacks jurisdiction over the appeals in Docket Nos. 82094 and 82234, they are dismissed. The parties shall proceed in Docket No. 82294. The stipulation to consolidate is disapproved as moot. The opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 82294 remain due to be filed by June 28, 2021. Nos. 82094/82234/82294. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC)21-17862
07/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20661
07/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 21, 2021. (SC)21-20661