Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82127
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A819712
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice CadishPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/10/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (A819712) (SC)20-43013
11/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (C156542) (SC)20-43019
12/04/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (C156542) (Second NOA) (SC)20-43967
12/04/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (A819712) (Second NOA) (SC)20-43968
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-44365
12/14/2020OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC)
12/22/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A819712 - Vol. 1. (SC)20-46152
12/23/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-20. DC# 99C156542-2 related case A-20-819712-W (Via FTP). (SC)20-46271
12/23/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)20-46453
12/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1 to 220, 221 to 386, 863 to 873, 3389 to 3393, 3435 to 3437, 3539 to 3543, 3562 to 3566, 3773 to 3777 and 4020 to 4152 (SEALED). (SC)
12/30/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Pre-sentence Investigation Report pages 1601 thru 1610 (SEALED). (SC)
02/10/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
03/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-06688
03/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
06/30/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
06/30/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for (En Banc) Reconsideration (Petition for Review). (SC)21-18758
09/13/2021Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalOrder Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1 [The Honorable Elissa Cadish Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC)21-26408
09/23/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-27539
09/23/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
10/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 24, 2021. (SC)21-27539