Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82146
Short Caption:WILSON, P.E. VS. AU-REKA GOLD CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lander Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 15CV-OTH-2020-0067Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC)
12/02/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-43599
12/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-43601
12/03/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-43861
12/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Notice of Appearance for Alex Flangas (SC)20-44228
12/09/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-44851
12/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Substitution of Respondent State Engineer. (SC)20-45914
12/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-45915
12/18/2020TranscriptFiled Transcript of CD Proceedings - 9/15/20. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 12/22/2020). (SC)
12/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Caption and Striking Transcript. Pursuant to the notice of substitution filed on December 18, 2020, Adam Sullivan, P.E., is substituted in this matter in place of Tim Wilson, P.E., as Nevada State Engineer. The clerk shall amend the caption accordingly. The clerk shall strike the transcript filed on December 18, 2020. Appellant shall include any necessary transcripts in the appendix. (SC)20-46155
12/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellant's response to file and serve any reply. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)20-46617
01/25/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-02133
02/02/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Notice of Errata to State Engineer's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-03245
02/08/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-03805
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-10215
05/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12708
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2021. (SC)21-12708