Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82151
Short Caption:SALVATORE ST. TR. VS. HAMPTON & HAMPTON, P.C.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82394
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A815386Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/07/2020 / Kuzemka, KristineSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/02/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-43676
12/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-43679
12/02/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau. (SC)
12/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)20-43723
12/07/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC)20-44219
12/23/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-46354
01/15/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for February 3, 2021, at 1:00 PM. (SC)21-01403
02/16/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 82151/82394. (SC)21-04427
02/17/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-04716
03/02/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/21/20 and 12/16/20. To Court Reporter: Brynn White. (SC)21-06119
05/17/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: June 1, 2021. (SC)21-14181
05/28/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to Submit Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC)21-15434
06/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until July 1, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-15515
06/09/2021MotionFiled Respondent Hampton & Hampton, P.C.'s Motion to Consolidate and Dismiss Appels with Prejudice and Motion for Attorney's Fees. (Nos. 82151/82394). (SC)21-16594
06/11/2021MotionFiled Response to Motion to Consolidate and Dismiss Appeals with Prejudice and Response to Motion for Attorney's Fees (Respondent Desert Crest Homeowners' Association). (SC)21-16852
06/16/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Attorney Fees. (SC)21-17422
06/28/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to Submit Opening Brief and Appendix (Third Request). (SC)21-18572
06/28/2021MotionFiled Respondent Hampton & Hampton, P.C.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Dismiss Appeals with Prejudice and Motion for Attorney's Fees (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/29/21). (SC)
06/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Dismiss Appeals with Prejudice and Motion for Attorney's Fees. (SC)21-18629
06/30/2021MotionFiled Respondent Hampton & Hampton, P.C.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Dismiss Appeals with Prejudice and Motion for Attorney's Fees. (SC)21-18873
06/30/2021BriefFiled Respondent Hampton & Hampton, P.C.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Dismiss Appeals with Prejudice and Motion for Attorney's Fees. (SC)21-18875
07/02/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDERS these appeals DISMISSED." fn1 [Respondent in Docket No. 82151, Desert Crest Homeowners Association, joins in the motion to dismiss but takes no position on the motion for attorney fees.] fn2 [ Hampton's motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of motion is granted. The reply was filed on June 30, 2021.] fn3 [The motion to consolidate the appeal and appellants' motion for a third extension of time to file the opening brief are denied as moot.] JH/RP/LS. Nos 82151/82394 (SC)21-19066
07/27/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur.(SC)21-21652
07/27/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. (SC)21-21652