Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82172
Short Caption:IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF JASON L. LOPEZ.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/11/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
12/07/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols 1 - 2, part 1. (SC).20-44231
12/07/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol 2, Cont..... (SC).20-44232
12/07/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol 2, Cont..... (SC).20-44233
12/07/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol 2, Cont..... (SC).20-44234
12/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).20-44236
12/08/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Portions of the Record of Bar Proceedings. (SEALED).
01/11/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)
01/12/2021MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief. (SC)21-00968
01/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until January 20, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief. (SC)21-01356
01/26/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-02403
02/25/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-05631
04/02/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Reply Brief. (SC)21-09629
04/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/07/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Denying Reinstatement. "We therefore approve the panel's recommendation and deny Lopez's petition for reinstatement." En Banc. (SC).21-16176
06/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Nevada State Bar's Notice to the Courts No. 82172. (SC)21-17107
07/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19080
07/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 12, 2021. (SC)21-19080