Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80554-COA
Short Caption:WHITE VS. WARD, M.D.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79289, 80554
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1802227Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "Given the foregoing, the district court did not err by dismissing White's negligence and vicarious liability claims against the medical respondents pursuant to NRS 41A.097(2), and we affirm that decision. Thus, given the foregoing, we reverse the district court's order dismissing White's claims against Merck and remand this matter for further proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-21329
08/04/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Re-Issue July 23, 2021 Order as an Opinion. (COA)21-22635
08/04/2021MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-22659
08/11/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (COA)21-23391
08/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Respondents' Motion to Re-Issue July 23, 2021 Order as an Opinion. (SC)21-23513
08/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Proof of Service - Respondents' Motion to Re-Issue July 23, 2021 Order as an Opinion. (SC)21-23548
08/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 14, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is timely filed, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur. (COA)21-24552
09/15/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to File Additional Pages on Petition for Rehearing. (COA)Y21-26715
09/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Publish. Having considered the motion, we conclude that publication is not warranted. NRAP 36(c)(1), (f)(4). Accordingly, we deny the motion. (COA)21-27380