Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81227-COA
Short Caption:WALKER (CHRISTIAN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):33637, 34061, 42292, 51720, 54570, 81227
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A801949, C146419Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Record due: 10 days. (SC)21-08172
03/22/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A801949 RELATED CASE C146419-2 - VOL 1 PART 1. (COA)21-08203
03/22/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A801949 RELATED CASE C146419-2 - VOL 2. (COA)21-08204
03/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order for Response. We direct the Attorney General to file a response within 30 days from the date of this order. (COA)21-08585
05/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order for Response. We direct the Attorney General to file a response within 10 days from the date of this order. (COA)21-13156
05/18/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Heather D. Procter. (SC)21-14323
05/18/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to File Late Pleading. (SC)21-14325
05/18/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-14326
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [Good cause appearing, we grant respondent's motion to file late pleading.] Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-14926
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)