Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79161-COA
Short Caption:GEORGANTAS (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78504, 79161
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C311820Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-10515
04/20/2021MotionFiled Proper Person "Motion to Withdraw Counsel - Conflict of Interest. Request Remand to District Court Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence Substantial Issues Exist to Stay Appeal. Appoint Conflict-free Counsel for Appeal and Assist District Court Motion as Stand-by Counsel." (COA)21-11360
04/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion to discharge his appointed counsel and for the appointment of substitute counsel. Appellant's motion is denied. (COA)21-11598
05/03/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Appointed Counsel Request Remand to District Court Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence Substantial Issues Exist to Stay Appeal Appoint Conflict Free Counsel for Appeal and Assist District Court Motion as Standby Counsel. (COA)21-12562
05/10/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Counsel - Conflict of Interest, Request Remand to District Court Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence Substantial Issues Exist to Stay Appeal Appoint Conflict Free Counsel for Appeal and Assist District Court Motion as Standby Counsel with Attachments. (STRICKEN PER 5/13/21 ORDER). (SC)
05/10/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Seek Enlargement of Page Limit of Motion to Withdraw Appointed Counsel, Stay of Remittitur, Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence (Pending) in District Court. (SC)21-13352
05/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing to Correct Inadvertent Denial of 'Notice of Emergency Motion' as Motion Itself and Request Permission to Exceed Pages Limits or in Alternative Accept Distilled Motion to Withdraw Appointed Counsel, Herein, and Stay Remittitur Per Pending Motion. (SC)21-13353
05/10/2021Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Filings. (SC)21-13354
05/10/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Stay Remittitur Pending Application to the Supreme Court of the United States for Writ of Certioriari. (SC)21-13355
05/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - 1.) Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Counsel - Conflict of Interest, Request Remand to District Court Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence Substantial Issues Exist to Stay Appeal Appoint Conflict Free Counsel for Appeal and Assist District Court Motion as Standby Counsel with Attachments; 2.) Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Seek Enlargement of Page Limit of Motion to Withdraw Appointed Counsel, Stay of Remittitur, Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence (Pending) in District Court; 3.) Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing to Correct Inadvertent Denial of 'Notice of Emergency Motion' as Motion Itself and Request Permission to Exceed Pages Limits or in Alternative Accept Distilled Motion to Withdraw Appointed Counsel, Herein, and Stay Remittitur Per Pending Motion; 4.) Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Filings. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-13357
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 22, 2021, this court denied appellant's motion to discharge his appointed counsel and to appoint substitute counsel. On May 3, 2021, appellant filed a second motion seeking similar relief. The motion is again denied. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file yet another motion to discharge his counsel in excess of the type volume limitation. Appellant's motion for leave to file a motion in excess of the page limit is denied. The clerk shall strike the motion to withdraw counsel filed on May 10, 2021. This court takes no action in regard to the "petition for rehearing" filed on May 10, 2021. This court takes no action in regard to appellant's pro se motion, filed on May 10, 2021, seeking a stay of the issuance of the remittitur. Appellant, proceeding through counsel, shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve either a petition for rehearing or a petition for review. (COA)21-13844
05/24/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Proof of Service - 1.) Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Counsel - Conflict of Interest, Request Remand to District Court Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence Substantial Issues Exist to Stay Appeal Appoint Conflict Free Counsel for Appeal and Assist District Court Motion as Standby Counsel with Attachments; 2.) Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Seek Enlargement of Page Limit of Motion to Withdraw Appointed Counsel, Stay of Remittitur, Pending Motion to Correct/Modify Illegal Sentence (Pending) in District Court; 3.) Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing to Correct Inadvertent Denial of 'Notice of Emergency Motion' as Motion Itself and Request Permission to Exceed Pages Limits or in Alternative Accept Distilled Motion to Withdraw Appointed Counsel, Herein, and Stay Remittitur Per Pending Motion; 4.) Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Filings. (COA)21-14843
06/03/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: June 17, 2021. (SC)21-15729
06/08/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Motion to Stay Remittitur Pending Application to the Supreme Court of the United States for Writ of Certiorari for Substantial, Precedential, Violation of Appellant's Fourteenth Amendment Rights. (COA)21-16445
06/16/2021MotionFiled Attorney Waleed Zaman's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (COA)21-17415
06/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-17557
06/30/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Seek Enlargement of (5) Page Limit to (9) Pages on Appellant's Response Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Filed by Appointed Appellate Attorney and Remand to District Court to Appoint Substitute Attorney to Assist Appellant in Petition for Reconsideration and Post Conviction. (COA)21-18751
06/30/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Response to Appointed Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Stay Remittitur to Provide Effective Petition for Rehearing as Ordered by the Reviewing Court. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 7/1/21). (COA)
07/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appointed attorney Waleed Zaman has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. This court concludes that Mr. Zaman does not demonstrate good cause warranting his withdrawal as counsel, and the motion is denied. Mr. Zaman shall have until July 19, 2021, to file either a petition for rehearing or review, if deemed necessary. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. Appellant's pro se motion for leave to file a response to Mr. Zaman's motion to withdraw in excess of the page limitation is denied. The clerk of this court shall strike the response filed on June 30, 2021. Appellant shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. (SC)21-19006
07/19/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-20768
07/22/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Notice of Motion and Motion to Disqualify Honorable Justice Gibbons for Conflict of Interest, Prejudice Inexcusable Mistake of Law Resulting in Fundamental Miscarriage of Justice to Appellant. (COA)21-21256
08/19/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-24214
09/13/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
09/13/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)