Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80366-COA
Short Caption:ULDRICKS VS. ULDRICKSCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80366
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D592428Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-10484
04/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT). (COA)21-11600
04/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Counsel for appellant has filed a notice of withdrawal as counsel of record for appellant. The notice is treated as a motion. As the time to file a petition for rehearing has not yet expired, the motion is denied. (SC)21-12332
05/03/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Regarding Counsel. (COA)21-12654
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order.Appellant's pro se document is treated as a motion to dismiss counsel and granted. This matter shall proceed with appellant in pro se. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve any petition for rehearing or petition for review. The clerk shall file this order in both courts. (COA)21-13755
05/24/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Relief Pursuant to Huneycutt. (COA)21-14858
05/25/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: June 10, 2021. (COA)21-14951
05/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's response to respondent's Motion for Relief Pursuant to Huneycutt due: June 15, 2021. (COA)21-15375
06/14/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-17016
06/14/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $150.00 from Marilyn A. Uldricks. Cashier's Check No. 9502031799. (COA)
06/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Proof of Service for Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-17021
06/18/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Response to Motion for Relief Pursuant to Huneycutt. (COA)21-17608
07/01/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Motion for Relief Pursuant to Huneycutt. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/1/21) (COA)
07/01/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/1/21) (COA)
07/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (COA)21-19027
07/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (COA)21-19029
07/01/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time. (COA)21-19033
07/05/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Substitution of Attorneys from Amanda M. Roberts to Doris Nehme-Tomalka. (COA)21-19176
07/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Doris Nehme-Tomalka has filed a notice substituting herself as counsel of record for respondent in place of Amanda M. Roberts. The substitution is approved. The clerk shall amend the docket accordingly. Given this substitution, this court will take no action on the motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of a motion for remand filed by respondent's previous counsel. Respondent's new counsel may file a motion for an extension of time, if deemed warranted, within 7 days of the date of this order. (COA)21-19406
07/14/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Response to Motion for Honeycutt Relief, or in the Alternative. Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Appellant's Response to Motion for Relief. (COA)21-20294
07/21/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We also deny respondent's motion for a remand. We likewise deny as moot respondent's motion to strike appellant's response or to extend time to file a reply] (COA)21-20995
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)