Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82213
Short Caption:VAN KIRK VS. CLARK CTY.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A812499Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/04/2021 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-45242
12/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-45244
12/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-45246
12/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Steven Sweikert, Senior Deputy District as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-46964
01/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. "This appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-00574
01/15/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal and to Reinstate Appeal. (SC)21-01470
01/21/2021MotionFiled Respondent Clark County's Statement of Non-Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal and to Reinstate Appeal. (SC)21-01740
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to remit the filing fee to this court and file the case appeal statement. Upon receipt of the filing fee and case appeal statement, the clerk of this court shall reinstate this appeal and refer this appeal to the settlement program. If the filing fee and case appeal statement are not received within this time period, this appeal shall remain dismissed. (SC)21-02838
02/01/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jason M. Wiley. (SC).
02/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-03176
02/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days.) (SC)21-03243
02/04/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)21-03404
02/17/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-04713
02/22/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)21-05234
02/23/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-05289
03/18/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/19/20. To Court Reporter: None listed. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/18/21). (SC)
03/18/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Notice of Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. (SC)21-07834
03/18/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Allow Filing of Notice of Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. (CERTIFICATE DETACHED AND FILED SEPARATELY PERE 3/26/21 ORDER) (SC)21-07872
03/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Extend Time to Allow Filing of Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. (SC)21-08608
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the certificate from the motion and shall file it separately. (SC)21-08666
03/26/2021Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-08667
04/01/2021MotionFiled Stipulated Motion to Stay. (SC)21-09499
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[This court takes no action in regard to the stipulation to stay these proceedings.] SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10138
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12538
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2021. (SC)21-12538