Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79465-COA
Short Caption:TREJO (RENATO) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78274, 79465
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C334292Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/16/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/19/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. (VACATED PER ORDER FILED 6/21/21). "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-07958
04/09/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition For Rehearing. (COA)21-10319
04/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 27, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition is timely fled, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur. (COA)21-11602
04/29/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-12374
06/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Amended Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn1[Having considered Trejo's petition for rehearing, we grant the petition, vacate our March 19, 2021, order of affirmance, and issue this amended order in its place.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-17714
07/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
07/16/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)