Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82225
Short Caption:MAIN ST. INVS. III, LLC VS. CROWDCREDIT ESTONIA OUCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A818285Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/30/2020 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/16/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-45587
12/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-45590
12/29/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Ian Christopherson. (SC)
12/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-46837
12/30/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)20-46897
01/12/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 28, 2021, at 2:30 PM. (SC)21-01007
01/19/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-01625
01/28/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement process is continued to the following date: February 3, 2021, at 2:30 PM. (SC)21-02749
02/05/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 5, 2021, at 2:00 PM. (SC)21-03659
02/05/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 19, 2021, at 2:00 PM. (SC)21-03660
02/19/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-05082
02/22/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-05205
04/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Mainstreet Investments III, LLC). (SC)21-10185
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This court dismisses this appeal." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-11037
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13493
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13493