Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82234
Short Caption:TOBIN VS. CHIESICourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82094, 82294
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A799890Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/29/2020 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/18/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-45890
12/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-45893
12/28/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Thomson Law PC, check no. 5479. (SC)
12/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-46831
12/29/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (SC)20-46849
01/19/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-01613
02/12/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The EAC was held on 2/5/21, and continued to 2/15/21 to give appellant's counsel time to confer with his client. Case Nos. 82094/82234/82294. (SC).21-04285
02/18/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Case Nos. 82094/82234/82294. (SC)21-04802
02/22/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-05141
03/11/2021Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-07176
04/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Change of Address for Law Firm Maurice Wood. (SC)21-12117
05/24/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-14824
06/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC)21-16230
06/10/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Consolidate Cases 82094/82234/82294. (SC)21-16781
06/22/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeals in Docket Nos. 82094 and 82234, and Disapproving Stipulation. As this court lacks jurisdiction over the appeals in Docket Nos. 82094 and 82234, they are dismissed. The parties shall proceed in Docket No. 82294. The stipulation to consolidate is disapproved as moot. The opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 82294 remain due to be filed by June 28, 2021. Nos. 82094/82234/82294. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC)21-17864
07/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20662
07/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 21, 2021. (SC)21-20662