Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82245
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. BURROW C/W 81978Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:81978*, 82245Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447, 80447-COA, 81218, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/22/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
12/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-46150
12/28/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ali Shahrokhi, check no. 4350. (SC)
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-01104
01/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC)21-01997
01/26/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)21-02366
02/05/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-22 (SEALED). (SC)
02/11/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Order Granting Expansion of Pages for Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC)21-04133
02/11/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/21/20, 09/22/20 and 09/23/20. (SC)21-04140
02/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance Yvonne Ruiz as counsel for Respondent). (SC).21-04278
02/12/2021Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).21-04305
02/12/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Seal Transcripts for Trial on 09/21/20, 09/22/20, 09/23/20. (SC).21-04306
02/12/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/21/20, 9/22/20, and 9/23/20. (SC)21-04318
02/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Cases, Denying Motion for Leave to File Stay Motion with Excess Pages, and Granting Motions to File Transcripts Under Seal. Appellant shall have until April 8, 2021, to file and serve a single opening brief or informal brief form addressing the issues in both of these consolidated cases. In docket no. 82245, the motion for leave to file an overlength stay motion is denied, and the clerk of this court is directed to return, unfiled, the February 11, 2021, proposed motion. The clerk shall file under seal the transcripts provisionally received in both dockets on February 12, 2021. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-04832
02/18/2021TranscriptFiled (Docket No. 81978) Proper Person Appellant's SEALED Transcripts, Vols. 1-4 (dates of 9/21/20, 9/22/20, and 9/23/20). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)
02/18/2021TranscriptFiled (Docket No. 82245) Proper Person Appellant's SEALED Transcripts, Vols. 1-4 (dates of 9/21/20, 9/22/20, and 9/23/20). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)
03/09/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-06797
03/11/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The motion of attorney Thomas Standish to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent is granted. The clerk shall remove Mr. Standish as counsel of record for respondent. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-07086
03/31/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: April 22, 2021. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-09306
03/31/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice, Appellant Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-09360
04/07/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Request for Judicial Notice Pursuant to NRS 47.140. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-10034
04/13/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Order Granting Expansion of Pages for Motion for Stay. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-10585
04/13/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Stay for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, Violation of Constitution and Equal Protection Rights and Newly Found Evidence Fraud. Nos. 81978/82245. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/22/21). (SC)
04/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice, Appellant Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-10681
04/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed pro se motions requesting (1) that this court recognize "FRAUD BROUGHT UPON THE COURT by officers of the court" and (2) this court issue an order removing Judge Matthew Harter from the bench. No cause appearing the motions are denied. Nos. 81798/82245. (SC)21-10931
04/15/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. Appellant's Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-10965
04/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for leave to file a motion for stay in excess of the page limitation. The motion for leave to file an overlong stay motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall strike the motion for stay filed on April 13, 2021. Appellant has also filed two motions for judicial notice. The motion requesting that this court take judicial notice of a "Motion to dismiss for lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction on 1099 Independent workers under Title 1V-D" is denied. The motion for judicial notice of NRS 33.020 and NRS 33.080 is granted to the following extent. This court shall take judicial notice of the existence and text of NRS 33.080 and NRS 33.080. All other relief requested in the motion is denied. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-11668
04/22/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-11682
05/03/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Stay for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, Violation of Constitution & Equal Protection Rights & Violation of Substantive and Procedural Due Process. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-12640
05/04/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-12788
05/11/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Order Granting Expansion of Pages for Fast Track Brief. (Opening Brief) Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-13495
05/11/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to seal Fast Track Statement. (Opening Brief). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-13497
05/12/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Motion to Disqualify Yvonne Ruiz, Esq., Thomas Standish, Esq., Phillip Spradling, Esq., and Standish Law Firm for Committing Perjury and Bringing Fraud Upon the Court." (STRICKEN PER 5/24/21 ORDER) Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)
05/18/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion for Order Granting Expansion of Pages for Fast Track Brief. (Combined Appeals) Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-14337
05/19/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Supplement Motion to Disqualify Yvonne Ruiz, Esq., Thomas Standish, Esq., Phillip Spradling, Esq., and Standish Law Firm for Committing Perjury and Bringing Fraud upon the Court. (STRICKEN PER 5/24/21 ORDER) Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)
05/20/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Supplement to Motion for Stay for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, Violation of Constitution and Equal Protection Rights and Violation of Substantive and Procedural Due Process. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-14550
05/24/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Reply to Respondent's Response to Motion for Order Granting Expansion of Pages for Fast Track Brief. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-14825
05/24/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief, a motion to seal the opening brief, a motion for leave to file a brief in excess of the page limitation, and a motion for judicial notice. The proposed brief contains 92 pages. Respondent opposes the motion for leave to file a brief in excess of the page limitation, and appellant has filed a reply. The motion to file a brief in excess of the page limitation is denied. The clerk shall return the pro se brief received on May 11, 2021, unfiled. Appellant's motion for leave to file the opening brief under seal is denied. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an informal brief on the form provided by the clerk of this court or an opening brief that complies with NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32. The clerk shall provide appellant with a blank "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties." Appellant's pro se motion for judicial notice is granted to the following extent. This court shall take judicial notice of the existence and text of Nev. Const. art 1, §8. All other relief requested in the motion is denied. Appellant has also filed a motion to disqualify certain attorneys and a supplement to the motion. , the clerk shall strike the motion filed on May 12, 2021, and the supplement filed on May 19, 2021. Nos 81978/82245 (SC)21-14837
05/25/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Emergency Motion to Reconsider Request for Stay Which was Denied Without Specific Reasons on 05/24/2021 Answer is Needed by 6/7/2021." Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-14934
05/27/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Supplement to Emergency Motion to Reconsider Request for Stay which was Denied Without Specific Reasons on 5/24/21. Answer is Needed by 6/7/21. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-15176
05/27/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Disqualify Yvonne Ruiz, Esq., Thomas Standish, Esq., Phillip Spradling, Esq., & Standish Law Firm for Committing Perjury & Bringing Fraud Upon the Court. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-15180
06/02/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion To Request for Reconsideration/Review of Denial of Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limitation to be Heard by 3 Justice Panel Per NARP 27(C)(2). Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-15654
06/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a stay pending appeal. The motion for a stay is denied. Appellant's request that the district judge be disqualified or prevented from continuing to preside over the case below is denied at this time. Appellant's request that this matter be immediately remanded for a new trial is not appropriately made in the context of a motion. Any other requests for relief are denied. fn1[Appellant has also filed an "emergency" motion to reconsider the purported denial of his motion for stay on May 24, 2021, and a supplement to that motion. This court's May 24, 2021, order did not address appellant's motion to stay. Accordingly, we take no action with respect to the motion for reconsideration or the supplement.] Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-16023
06/10/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has now filed a pro se motion for panel reconsideration of the order. The motion is denied. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-16673
06/10/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Request Reconsideration of Denial of Motion to Stay for Failing to Demonstrate NRAP 8(D) Factors in Favor of Stay. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-16681
06/10/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion to Stay Child Support Order Portion of Judgement Entered on 10/12/20. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-16758
06/14/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief. Nos. 81978/82245 (STRICKEN PER 7/19/21 ORDER). (SC)
06/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions to Disqualify, for Reconsideration, and for Stay. Three of appellants' motions are currently before the court. Having reviewed these three motions, they are denied. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-18331
06/29/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal, or in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Time to File an Answering Brief. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-18708
07/02/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Response to Motion to Strike Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal, or in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Time to File an Answering Brief. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-19112
07/09/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal, or in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Time to File an Answering Brief. (SC)21-19763
07/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 14, 2021, appellant filed an opening brief. Respondent now moves to strike the brief based on its noncompliance and to dismiss this appeal. Appellant opposes the motion. Respondent has replied. Having considered the filed brief and documents before this court, this court orders as follows. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on June 14, 2021. Appellant's opposition is treated as containing a motion for leave to file an overlength opening brief and granted to the following extent. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief that does not exceed 60 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation. Appellant's request to sanction respondent and respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal are denied. fn1 [The clerk of this court inadvertently filed the brief despite its procedural deficiencies.] Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-20711
08/06/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Immediately Establish Temporary Visitation De Novo Between Shahrokhi and his Minor Child While this Appeal is resolved. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-22891
08/06/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice for Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81978/82245(SC)21-22892
08/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. Nos. 81978/72245. (SC)21-23129
08/16/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Combined Opening Brief (81978/82245). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-23822
08/24/2021MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondent and to Extend Deadline to File Answering Brief (Yvonne Ruiz). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-24718
08/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's pro se motion for judicial notice is denied. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-24946
08/27/2021MotionFiled Proper Person's Opposition to Motion to Respondent's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-24995
09/02/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondonts' [sic] Counsel's Motion to Withdraw. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-25644
09/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for immediate temporary visitation and other relief pending resolution of these consolidated appeals. Having considered the motion, this court concludes that the relief appellant seeks is best sought in the district court in the first instance. Accordingly, the motion is denied. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-26348
09/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The motion of attorney Yvonne Ruiz to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent is granted. The clerk shall remove Ms. Ruiz as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent's notice of appearance due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. Given this suspension, Ms. Ruiz's request for an extension of time to file the answering brief is denied as moot. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-26512
09/20/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-27141
09/20/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Clarification. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-27142
09/27/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion for Immediate Injunction Requiring the Minor Child be put back in Private School while the Consolidated Appeals are Resolved. Nos. 81978/82245. (STRICKEN PER 10/15/21 ORDER). (SC)
09/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person's Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-27768
09/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's pro se motion for judicial notice filed on September 20, 2021, is denied. (SC)21-27872
09/28/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion for Stay , Due to Substantial Changes in Circumstances and Newly Found Information. (STRICKEN PER 10/15/21 ORDER). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)
09/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-27940
10/01/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Supplement to Emergency Motion for Stay Pursuant to NRAP 8(A)(2)(D), Due to Substantial Changes in Circumstances and Newly Found Information." Action Necessary by October 8, 2021. (STRICKEN PER 10/15/21 ORDER). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)
10/01/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Third Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-28259
10/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person 2nd Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-28268
10/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice to Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court Pursuant to NRAP 44. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-28269
10/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Certification. The clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Aaron D. Ford, Attorney General of the state of Nevada, that on October 1, 2021, appellant filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 125C.003. NRS 125C.0035, NRS 125C.006. NRS 125C.0065, NRS 125C.007. See NRAP 44. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-28668
10/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Appearance. Respondent Notifies this court that she will not be retaining new counsel. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)21-29308
10/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Striking Documents and Granting Motion for Judicial Notice. Appellant has filed pro se motions seeking an injunction requiring the minor child to be placed into private school and a stay pending appeal. Appellant has also filed a supplement to the motion for a stay. The clerk shall strike the motions filed on September 27, 2021, and September 28, 2021, and the supplement filed on October 1, 2021. Appellant's September 27, 2021, pro se motion for judicial notice is granted to the following extent. This court shall take judicial notice of this court's opinion in In the Matter of Hughes, 136 Nev. 399, 467 P.3d 627 (2020), and the unpublished disposition in Shahrokhi v. District Ct., Docket No. 79336-COA, (Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Part and Denying Petition in Part, 2019). Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-29728
10/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Respondent has now filed a notice of appearance indicating that she will be proceeding pro se. Respondent shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve any answering brief. If respondent does not intend to file an answering brief, so notifying this court, in writing and immediately, will expedite the submission of this appeal to the court. Nos. 81978/82245. (SC)21-29917
10/20/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion for Stay. Nos. 81978/82245 (SC)Y21-30248
10/20/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion for Immediate Injunction Requiring that the minor child be taken out of Public School and Immediately be placed back in Private School. No. 81978/82245 (SC)Y21-30250