Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82246
Short Caption:PATEL (CHIRAGKUMAR) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C350439Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Habeas Corpus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/22/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (SC)20-46169
12/22/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)20-46170
12/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-47078
01/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Notice of Appearance for Taleen Pandukht. (SC)21-02559
01/27/2021BriefFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Writ. (SC)21-02560
01/27/2021AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Appendix to Answer to Writ. (SC)21-02561
02/04/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answering Brief. (SC)21-03427
02/04/2021AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix. (SC)21-03514
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13937
05/21/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)Y21-14697
05/21/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
06/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-16113
06/14/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule. (SC)21-16970
06/17/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. (SC)21-17452
06/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion of real party in interest for an extension of time to file its answer to the petition for rehearing is granted to the following extent. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). Real party in interest shall have until August 2, 2021, to file and serve its answer. Petitioner's motion to reset the briefing schedule is denied as moot. (SC)21-17938
08/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest's Notice of Appearance for John Niman. (SC)21-22371
08/02/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Unopposed Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule or, Alternatively, for Extension of Time. (SC)21-22373
08/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest's motion to stay briefing or for a second extension of time to file the answer to the petition for rehearing is granted to the following extent. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). Real party in interest shall have until November 2, 2021, to file and serve an answer to the petition. (SC)21-23448