Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81978-COA
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. BURROWCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447, 80447-COA, 81218, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 82245, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA)
12/24/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Order Granting Expansion of Pages for Emergency Motion for Stay. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 12/24/20). (SC)20-46557
12/28/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(E) Motion for Transmittal of Report Involving Minor Child (Action Requested by Date or Event). (TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT PER 1/21/21 ORDER.) (COA)20-46618
12/30/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Extend Time in Which to File the Motion to Disqualify or in the Alternative Accept a Late Filing; and Permission to Exceed the Page Limit. (TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT PER 12/31/20 ORDER) (COA)20-46911
01/04/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion seeking an Order to Show Cause. (TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT PER 1/21/21 ORDER.) (SC)21-00072
01/21/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. COA)
01/21/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed